KS HB2661 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for a 10% normal tax rate on certain corporate income.
Title
Providing for a 10% normal tax rate on certain corporate income.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Hodge [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in Committee |
2018-03-12 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 12, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 346-S |
2018-02-07 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2018-02-07 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2661/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2661_00_0000.pdf |