KS HB2650 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designating February 15 of each year as Susan B. Anthony Day in the state of Kansas.
Title
Designating February 15 of each year as Susan B. Anthony Day in the state of Kansas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2020-03-11 | House | House Withdrawn from Consent Calendar and placed on General Orders |
2020-03-10 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2020-03-10 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 10, 2020, 9:00 AM Room 346-S |
2020-02-13 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2020-02-12 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2650/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2650_00_0000.pdf |