KS HB2644 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Budget process; exempting postsecondary educational institutions from the program service inventory, integrated budget fiscal process and performance-based budgeting system if such institution has implemented performance agreements.
Title
Budget process; exempting postsecondary educational institutions from the program service inventory, integrated budget fiscal process and performance-based budgeting system if such institution has implemented performance agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 82 Nay: 42 (Y: 82 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2018-03-27 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 82 Nay: 42 |
2018-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2018-03-26 | House | House Representative Whitmer raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane. |
2018-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Bishop |
2018-03-14 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Higher Education Budget |
2018-03-12 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 12, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 281-N |
2018-03-06 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Higher Education Budget |
2018-02-13 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Higher Education Budget; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-06 | House | House Referred to Committee on Higher Education Budget |
2018-02-06 | House | House Introduced |