KS HB2634 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for payroll deductions for indemnity insurance.
Title
Providing for payroll deductions for indemnity insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2018-02-19 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on General Government Budget |
2018-02-13 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 13, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 218-N |
2018-02-06 | House | House Referred to Committee on General Government Budget |
2018-02-06 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2634/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2634_00_0000.pdf |