KS HB2629 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the secretary for aging and disability services to regulate supplemental nursing services agencies in the state of Kansas.
Title
Requiring the secretary for aging and disability services to regulate supplemental nursing services agencies in the state of Kansas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in Committee |
2020-02-20 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 20, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 346-S |
2020-02-11 | House | House Referred to Committee on Children and Seniors |
2020-02-11 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2629/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2629_00_0000.pdf |