KS HB2629 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Homeowners associations subject to consumer protection act; annual registration; fee.
Title
Homeowners associations subject to consumer protection act; annual registration; fee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2018-03-29 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to recommend favorably for passage failed |
2018-03-29 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Williams was rejected |
2018-03-29 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Williams |
2018-03-29 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-03-21 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Local Government |
2018-03-01 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Local Government |
2018-02-21 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Local Government; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-15 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 15, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 281-N |
2018-02-06 | House | House Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2018-02-06 | House | House Introduced |