KS HB2619 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House No motion to reconsider vetoed bill; Veto sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House No motion to reconsider vetoed bill; Veto sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2619 by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance - Enacting the Kansas economic recovery loan deposit program, updating field of membership requirements of credit unions and allowing privilege tax deductions on agricultural real estate loans and single family residence loans.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2619 by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance - Enacting the Kansas economic recovery loan deposit program, updating field of membership requirements of credit unions and allowing privilege tax deductions on agricultural real estate loans and single family residence loans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-21 - House - House Concurred with amendments - Yea: 114 Nay: 3 (Y: 114 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 29 Nay: 11 (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 118 Nay: 7 (Y: 118 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Xu was rejected - Yea: 38 Nay: 81 (Y: 38 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2020-05-21 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 29 Nay: 11 (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 118 Nay: 7 (Y: 118 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Xu was rejected - Yea: 38 Nay: 81 (Y: 38 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House No motion to reconsider vetoed bill; Veto sustained |
2020-05-21 | House | House Vetoed by Governor; Returned to House on Monday, June 1, 2020 |
2020-05-21 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 26, 2020 |
2020-05-21 | House | House Concurred with amendments; Yea: 114 Nay: 3 |
2020-05-21 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 29 Nay: 11 |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Report adopted |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 18, 2020, 9:30 AM Room 546-S - CANCELED |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 17, 2020, 9:30 AM Room 546-S |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2020-02-26 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 118 Nay: 7 |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Xu was withdrawn |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Xu |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Xu was rejected Yea: 38 Nay: 81 |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Xu |
2020-02-19 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions |
2020-02-19 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 19, 2020, 9:00 AM Room 281-N |
2020-02-11 | House | House Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions |
2020-02-11 | House | House Introduced |