KS HB2619 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, March 29, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, March 29, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing any documentation required under the Kansas pesticide law to be created or maintained in electronic form.
Title
Allowing any documentation required under the Kansas pesticide law to be created or maintained in electronic form.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 0 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 0 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, March 29, 2018 |
2018-03-26 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, March 26, 2018 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing and possible action: Tuesday, March 13, 2018, 08:30 AM Room 159-S |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2018-02-22 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 117 Nay: 0 |
2018-02-22 | House | House Engrossed on Wednesday, February 21, 2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-02-14 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture |
2018-02-12 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 12, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 582-N |
2018-02-05 | House | House Referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2018-02-05 | House | House Introduced |