KS HB2617 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, May 17 , 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, May 17 , 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Workers compensation; medical administrator; electronic filing; records disclosure.
Title
Workers compensation; medical administrator; electronic filing; records disclosure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-30 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 113 Nay: 0 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 115 Nay: 5 (Y: 115 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Carmichael was rejected - Yea: 36 Nay: 78 (Y: 36 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 115 Nay: 5 (Y: 115 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Carmichael was rejected - Yea: 36 Nay: 78 (Y: 36 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, May 17 , 2016 |
2016-06-01 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, May 09, 2016 |
2016-05-01 | House | House Reengrossed on Monday, May 02 , 2016 |
2016-04-30 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 113 Nay: 0 |
2016-04-30 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2016-04-28 | House | House Representative Frownfelter replaces Representative Carmichael on the Conference Committee |
2016-04-27 | House | House Representative Carmichael replaces Representative Frownfelter on the Conference Committee |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Lynn, Senator Wagle and Senator Holland appointed as conferees |
2016-03-22 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Hutton , Representative Mason and Representative Frownfelter as conferees |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 16, 2016, 8:30 AM Room 548-S |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2016-03-14 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 115 Nay: 5 |
2016-03-14 | House | House Engrossed on Friday, March 11 , 2016 |
2016-03-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2016-03-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Carmichael was rejected Yea: 36 Nay: 78 |
2016-03-11 | House | House Representative Hutton raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane. |
2016-03-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Carmichael |
2016-03-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2016-03-08 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2016-03-02 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2016-02-22 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-02-12 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 15, 2016, 1:30 PM Room 346-S |
2016-02-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2016-02-04 | House | House Introduced |