KS HB2615 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute for HB 2615 by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development - Workers compensation assigned risk pool.
Title
Substitute for HB 2615 by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development - Workers compensation assigned risk pool.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 98 Nay: 25 (Y: 98 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2014-03-26 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 98 Nay: 25 |
2014-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended |
2014-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to refer to committee failed Committee on Insurance |
2014-03-31 | House | House Committee of the Whole -- Motion to amend by Representative Frownfelter ruled not germane. |
2014-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Frownfelter |
2014-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hutton was adopted |
2014-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hutton |
2014-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2014-03-24 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by |
2014-03-12 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 18, 2014, 1:30 PM Room 346-S |
2014-03-10 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Taxation; Rereferred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2014-02-25 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development; Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2014-02-14 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 20, 2014, 1:30 PM Room 346-S |
2014-02-11 | House | House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2014-02-11 | House | House Introduced |