KS HB2608 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regulating funeral processions and creating a violation for not properly yielding to funeral processions.
Title
Regulating funeral processions and creating a violation for not properly yielding to funeral processions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2020-02-20 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation |
2020-02-18 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 18, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 582-N |
2020-02-11 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-02-11 | House | House Introduced |