KS HB2604 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Secretary of state; posting precinct level election results; certain offices.
Title
Secretary of state; posting precinct level election results; certain offices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 0 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died on Senate General Orders |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 20, 2018, 09:30 AM Room 142-S |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2018-02-28 | House | House Engrossed on Friday, February 23, 2018 |
2018-02-22 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 117 Nay: 0 |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-02-20 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Elections |
2018-02-14 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 14, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 281-N |
2018-02-01 | House | House Referred to Committee on Elections |
2018-02-01 | House | House Introduced |