KS HB2602 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 24, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Substitute for HB 2602 by the Committee on Education - Creating the legislative task force on dyslexia.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Substitute for HB 2602 by the Committee on Education - Creating the legislative task force on dyslexia.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-07 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 120 Nay: 0 (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-07 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 110 Nay: 7 (Y: 110 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26HouseHouse Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 24, 2018
2018-04-26HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, April 16, 2018
2018-04-07HouseHouse Reengrossed on Saturday, April 7, 2018
2018-04-07HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 120 Nay: 0
2018-04-07HouseHouse Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2018-04-07SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2018-04-07SenateSenate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2018-04-06SenateSenate Conference committee report now available
2018-04-03HouseHouse Representative Aurand, Representative Dietrich, and Representative Winn are appointed to replace Representative Aurand, Representative Dierks, and Representative Winn on the Conference Committee
2018-03-29SenateSenate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Baumgardner, Senator Alley and Senator Pettey appointed as conferees
2018-03-29HouseHouse Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Aurand , Representative Dierks and Representative Winn as conferees
2018-03-28SenateSenate Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2018-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2018-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2018-03-22SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education
2018-03-14SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, March 14, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 144-S
2018-03-01SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Education
2018-02-28SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2018-02-22HouseHouse Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 110 Nay: 7
2018-02-22HouseHouse Engrossed on Thursday, February 22, 2018
2018-02-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2018-02-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Dietrich was adopted
2018-02-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Dietrich
2018-02-22HouseHouse Representative Dietrich raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
2018-02-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hodge
2018-02-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Davis was adopted
2018-02-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Davis
2018-02-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2018-02-15HouseHouse Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Education
2018-02-07HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, February 07, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 546-S
2018-02-01HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Education
2018-02-01HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2602/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2602_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2602_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2602_02_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2602_03_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2602_enrolled.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20180222185322_176653/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20180328110020_781424/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20180407115805_999483/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20180407172534_728625/

Bill Comments

feedback