KS HB2601 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died on Senate Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring certain persons on a third or subsequent conviction of driving under the influence to participate in a multidisciplinary model of services for substance use disorders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring certain persons on a third or subsequent conviction of driving under the influence to participate in a multidisciplinary model of services for substance use disorders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-22 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 119 Nay: 0 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-30SenateSenate Died on Senate Calendar
2024-03-21SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
2024-03-20SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, March 20, 2024, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2024-03-20SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, March 20, 2024, 10:30 AM Room 548-S
2024-02-29SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2024-02-28SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2024-02-22HouseHouse Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 119 Nay: 0
2024-02-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2024-02-07HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
2024-02-01HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, February 1, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 546-S
2024-01-25HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
2024-01-25HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback