KS HB2597 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 18, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 18, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Local government; Sedgwick county designated as urban area, role of mayor clarified, county authority over election commissioners extended.
Title
Local government; Sedgwick county designated as urban area, role of mayor clarified, county authority over election commissioners extended.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-06 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 90 Nay: 30 (Y: 90 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 29 Nay: 10 (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 1 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 1 (Y: 121 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 29 Nay: 10 (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 1 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 1 (Y: 121 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 18, 2018 |
2018-04-26 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, April 16, 2018 |
2018-04-06 | House | House Engrossed on Friday, April 6, 2018 |
2018-04-06 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 90 Nay: 30 |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 29 Nay: 10 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Bowers, Senator Fitzgerald and Senator Faust-Goudeau appointed as conferees |
2018-03-28 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Williams , Representative Thimesch and Representative Alcala as conferees |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 1 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Fitzgerald was adopted |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Fitzgerald |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 15, 2018, 09:30 AM Room 142-S |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2018-02-21 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 1 |
2018-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2018-02-14 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Local Government |
2018-02-13 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 13, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 281-N |
2018-02-08 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 08, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 281-N - CANCELLED |
2018-02-01 | House | House Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2018-02-01 | House | House Introduced |