KS HB2596 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing an alcoholic liquor manufacturer to obtain a drinking establishment license under certain conditions.
Title
Allowing an alcoholic liquor manufacturer to obtain a drinking establishment license under certain conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 113 Nay: 7 (Y: 113 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2020-03-12 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 113 Nay: 7 |
2020-03-12 | House | House Engrossed on Wednesday, March 11, 2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2020-03-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2020-02-18 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 18, 2020, 9:00 AM Room 346-S |
2020-02-07 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2020-02-07 | House | House Introduced |