KS HB2595 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-27 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 2, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Eliminating the 30-day delay before offering state surplus property for sale to the general public.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eliminating the 30-day delay before offering state surplus property for sale to the general public.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 36 Nay: 3 (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 118 Nay: 3 (Y: 118 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-27HouseHouse Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 2, 2020
2020-04-27HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, March 24, 2020
2020-03-17SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 36 Nay: 3
2020-03-17SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2020-03-05SenateSenate Withdrawn from Consent Calendar and placed on General Orders
2020-03-04SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
2020-03-04SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, March 4, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 548-S
2020-02-21SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2020-02-20SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2020-02-20HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 118 Nay: 3
2020-02-20HouseHouse Engrossed on Thursday, February 20, 2020
2020-02-19HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2020-02-19HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2020-02-13HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on General Government Budget
2020-02-10HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, February 10, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 281-N
2020-02-07HouseHouse Referred to Committee on General Government Budget
2020-02-07HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback