KS HB2592 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making and concerning supplemental appropriations for fiscal years 2022, 2023, 2024 and 2025 for various state agencies.
Title
Making and concerning supplemental appropriations for fiscal years 2022, 2023, 2024 and 2025 for various state agencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in Committee |
2022-03-03 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 3, 2022, 9:00 AM Room 112-N |
2022-02-01 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-01 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/hb2592/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/hb2592_00_0000.pdf |