KS HB2587 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the department for children and families to respond to reports of juveniles with problem sexual behavior.
Title
Requiring the department for children and families to respond to reports of juveniles with problem sexual behavior.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2018-03-08 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2018-02-14 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 14, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 346-S |
2018-01-31 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2018-01-31 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2587/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2587_00_0000.pdf |