KS HB2586 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Affording public employees and professional employees certain rights with respect to withholding of public employee organization and professional employee organization dues.
Title
Affording public employees and professional employees certain rights with respect to withholding of public employee organization and professional employee organization dues.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2020-02-26 | House | House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2020-02-12 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 12, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 112-N |
2020-02-07 | House | House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2020-02-06 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2586/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2586_00_0000.pdf |