KS HB2585 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, June 1, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Senate Substitute for HB 2585 by Committee on Utilities - Exempting certain public utilities from Kansas income taxation and allowing the state corporation commission to approve certain contract and reduced electric rates and associated cost recovery from all rate classes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senate Substitute for HB 2585 by Committee on Utilities - Exempting certain public utilities from Kansas income taxation and allowing the state corporation commission to approve certain contract and reduced electric rates and associated cost recovery from all rate classes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-21 - House - House Concurred with amendments - Yea: 75 Nay: 45 (Y: 75 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 1 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 2 (Y: 123 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21HouseHouse Approved by Governor on Monday, June 1, 2020
2020-05-21HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 26, 2020
2020-05-21HouseHouse Concurred with amendments; Yea: 75 Nay: 45
2020-05-21HouseHouse Motion to nonconcur with amendments and appoint conferees failed; Representative Seiwert , Representative Schreiber and Representative Finney as conferees
2020-05-21HouseHouse Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2020-05-21SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 1
2020-05-21SenateSenate Committee Report adopted
2020-05-21SenateSenate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2020-05-21SenateSenate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means and re-referred to Committee of the Whole
2020-05-21SenateSenate Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2020-03-17SenateSenate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Utilities
2020-03-17SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, March 17, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 548-S
2020-03-05SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Utilities
2020-03-04SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2020-03-04HouseHouse Engrossed on Friday, February 28, 2020
2020-02-26HouseHouse Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 2
2020-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2020-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Finney was adopted
2020-02-26HouseHouse Representative Cox raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane.
2020-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Finney
2020-02-24HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications
2020-02-13HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, February 13, 2020, 9:00 AM Room 582-N
2020-02-13HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, February 13, 2020, 9:00 AM Room 281-N - CANCELED
2020-02-07HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications
2020-02-06HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback