KS HB2572 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the educator protection act to provide excess professional liability insurance coverage for teachers.
Title
Creating the educator protection act to provide excess professional liability insurance coverage for teachers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in Committee |
2020-02-10 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 10, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 218-N |
2020-02-07 | House | House Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-02-06 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2572/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2572_00_0000.pdf |