KS HB2572 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute for HB 2572 by Committee on Taxation - Requiring the department of commerce to create a database of economic development incentive program information.
Title
Substitute for HB 2572 by Committee on Taxation - Requiring the department of commerce to create a database of economic development incentive program information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-09 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 114 Nay: 7 (Y: 114 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Assessment and Taxation; Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2018-03-09 | House | House Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 114 Nay: 7 |
2018-03-08 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2018-03-08 | House | House Representative Weber raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane. |
2018-03-08 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Whipple |
2018-03-08 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Elliott was rejected |
2018-03-08 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Elliott |
2018-03-08 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to rerefer to committee failed |
2018-03-08 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2018-03-06 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Taxation |
2018-02-19 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 19, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 346-S |
2018-02-15 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 15, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 112-N - CANCELLED |
2018-02-13 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development; Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2018-01-30 | House | House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2018-01-30 | House | House Introduced |