KS HB2568 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing loss thresholds for felony property crimes.
Title
Increasing loss thresholds for felony property crimes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 96 Nay: 21 (Y: 96 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2018-02-22 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 96 Nay: 21 |
2018-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2018-02-19 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2018-02-07 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 07, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 152-S |
2018-01-29 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2018-01-29 | House | House Introduced |