KS HB2567 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, March 22, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, March 22, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amending criminal code rules for determination of an offender's criminal history classification.
Title
Amending criminal code rules for determination of an offender's criminal history classification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 117 Nay: 0 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 117 Nay: 0 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, March 22, 2018 |
2018-03-20 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, March 20, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 06, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2018-02-22 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 117 Nay: 0 |
2018-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2018-02-19 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2018-02-07 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 07, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 152-S |
2018-01-29 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2018-01-29 | House | House Introduced |