KS HB2546 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Depositing all state sales tax revenues from sales on the Kansas state fairgrounds into the state fair capital improvements fund.
Title
Depositing all state sales tax revenues from sales on the Kansas state fairgrounds into the state fair capital improvements fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Don Schroeder [R] | Rep. Tory Arnberger [R] | Rep. Sydney Carlin [D] | Rep. Lonnie Clark [R] |
Rep. Jim Gartner [D] | Rep. Larry Hibbard [R] | Rep. Steven Johnson [R] | Rep. Jarrod Ousley [D] |
Rep. Tom Sloan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2018-02-02 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources Budget |
2018-01-31 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 31, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 142-S |
2018-01-25 | House | House Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources Budget |
2018-01-25 | House | House Introduced |