KS HB2543 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died on Senate Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring approval of livestock brand applications by the animal health commissioner and increasing the maximum amount for brand registration and renewal fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring approval of livestock brand applications by the animal health commissioner and increasing the maximum amount for brand registration and renewal fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-29 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 111 Nay: 4 (Y: 111 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-30SenateSenate Died on Senate Calendar
2024-03-20SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
2024-03-12SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2024, 8:30 AM Room 144-S
2024-03-05SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
2024-03-04SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2024-02-29HouseHouse Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 111 Nay: 4
2024-02-29HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2024-02-28HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations and re-referred to Committee of the Whole
2024-02-23HouseHouse Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2024-02-15HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
2024-02-08HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, February 8, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 112-N
2024-01-18HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
2024-01-18HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback