KS HB2542 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the crime of abuse of a sports official and providing criminal penalties therefor.
Title
Creating the crime of abuse of a sports official and providing criminal penalties therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 9, 2022, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2022-01-25 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-01-25 | House | House Introduced |