KS HB2537 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Redevelopment authorities; Johnson and Labette counties.
Title
Redevelopment authorities; Johnson and Labette counties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2018-03-09 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Taxation |
2018-03-07 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 07, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 346-S |
2018-01-24 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2018-01-24 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2537/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2537_00_0000.pdf |