KS HB2534 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Abolishing the well plugging assurance fund and transferring all assets and liabilities to the abandoned oil and gas well fund.
Title
Abolishing the well plugging assurance fund and transferring all assets and liabilities to the abandoned oil and gas well fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in Committee |
2020-02-13 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 13, 2020, 9:00 AM Room 112-N |
2020-01-30 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-30 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2534/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2534_00_0000.pdf |