KS HB2527 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removing the authority for law enforcement officers to deliver a child in need of care to a court services officer and prohibiting supervision of persons found not guilty by reason of mental disease or defect by court services officers.
Title
Removing the authority for law enforcement officers to deliver a child in need of care to a court services officer and prohibiting supervision of persons found not guilty by reason of mental disease or defect by court services officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2022-02-10 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-01-25 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 25, 2022, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2022-01-21 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-01-21 | House | House Introduced |