KS HB2525 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, March 29, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, March 29, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for additional sources of revenue for the water program management fund and creating additional fees for the regulation of underground injection control wells.
Title
Providing for additional sources of revenue for the water program management fund and creating additional fees for the regulation of underground injection control wells.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 1 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 87 Nay: 24 (Y: 87 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 87 Nay: 24 (Y: 87 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | House | House Approved by Governor on Friday, March 29, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, March 26, 2024 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 1 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 6, 2024, 8:30 AM Room 144-S |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2024-02-14 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 87 Nay: 24 |
2024-02-14 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, February 13, 2024 |
2024-02-13 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2024-02-13 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2024-02-05 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2024-01-30 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 30, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 112-N |
2024-01-17 | House | House Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2024-01-17 | House | House Introduced |