KS HB2525 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designating a bridge on United States highway 77 as the PFC Loren H. Larson memorial bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge on United States highway 77 as the PFC Loren H. Larson memorial bridge.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 11, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 582-N |
2020-02-05 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 5, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 582-N - CANCELED |
2020-01-29 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-29 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2525/ |
Text | http://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2525_00_0000.pdf |