KS HB2524 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the secretary for aging and disability services to regulate supplemental nursing services agencies in the state of Kansas.
Title
Requiring the secretary for aging and disability services to regulate supplemental nursing services agencies in the state of Kansas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2022-02-18 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Children and Seniors |
2022-02-01 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 1, 2022, 1:30 PM Room 152-S |
2022-01-20 | House | House Referred to Committee on Children and Seniors |
2022-01-20 | House | House Introduced |