KS HB2522 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the rural hospital innovation grant program.
Title
Establishing the rural hospital innovation grant program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2020-03-13 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-19 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 19, 2020, 9:00 AM Room 112-N |
2020-01-29 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-29 | House | House Introduced |