KS HB2518 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the city general improvement and assessment law dealing with the creation of improvement districts; requiring mailed notice by first class mail to all property owners proposed to be included in an improvement district; eliminating the ability of resident property owners of more than one-half the area proposed to be included in an improvement district to petition to form a district; and requiring disclosure in real estate contracts that the property is subject to special assessments and making such contracts voidable by the buyer if such notice is not included in the contract.
Title
Amending the city general improvement and assessment law dealing with the creation of improvement districts; requiring mailed notice by first class mail to all property owners proposed to be included in an improvement district; eliminating the ability of resident property owners of more than one-half the area proposed to be included in an improvement district to petition to form a district; and requiring disclosure in real estate contracts that the property is subject to special assessments and making such contracts voidable by the buyer if such notice is not included in the contract.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 9, 2022, 9:00 AM Room 281-N |
2022-02-02 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 2, 2022, 9:00 AM Room 281-N - CANCELED |
2022-01-20 | House | House Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2022-01-20 | House | House Introduced |