KS HB2517 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Kansas lottery; permit lottery ticket vending machines and bingo ticket vending machines; lottery sunset extended; debt setoff; certain lottery money pledged to mental health and community crisis programs.
Title
Kansas lottery; permit lottery ticket vending machines and bingo ticket vending machines; lottery sunset extended; debt setoff; certain lottery money pledged to mental health and community crisis programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2018-03-23 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2018-02-15 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 15, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 346-S |
2018-01-24 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2018-01-22 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-01-22 | House | House Introduced |