KS HB2506 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing students enrolled in virtual schools to participate in activities that are regulated by the Kansas state high school activities association at such student’s resident school district without a minimum enrollment requirement in such resident school district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing students enrolled in virtual schools to participate in activities that are regulated by the Kansas state high school activities association at such student’s resident school district without a minimum enrollment requirement in such resident school district.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-30HouseHouse Died in Committee
2024-02-19HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget
2024-02-16HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on K-12 Education Budget; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2024-01-24HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, January 24, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 546-S
2024-01-16HouseHouse Referred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget
2024-01-16HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback