KS HB2498 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the secretary of health and environment from requiring COVID-19 vaccination for children attending school.
Title
Prohibiting the secretary of health and environment from requiring COVID-19 vaccination for children attending school.
Sponsors
Rep. Brett Fairchild [R] | Rep. Jesse Burris [R] | Rep. Randy Garber [R] | Rep. Steven Howe [R] |
Rep. Trevor Jacobs [R] | Rep. Tatum Lee-Hahn [R] | Rep. Michael Murphy [R] | Rep. Pat Proctor [R] |
Rep. Bill Rhiley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in Committee |
2022-02-21 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 21, 2022, 1:30 PM Room 112-N |
2022-02-18 | House | House Hearing: Friday, February 18, 2022, 1:30 PM Room 112-N - CANCELED |
2022-01-20 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2022-01-20 | House | House Introduced |