KS HB2493 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring legislative members of the sentencing commission to be members of senate judiciary and house corrections and juvenile justice.
Title
Requiring legislative members of the sentencing commission to be members of senate judiciary and house corrections and juvenile justice.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2020-02-11 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2020-02-03 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 3, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 152-S |
2020-01-23 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2020-01-23 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2493/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2493_00_0000.pdf |