KS HB2492 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing sales tax authority for certain counties and sales tax exemptions for certain organizations and coins or bullion.
Title
Providing sales tax authority for certain counties and sales tax exemptions for certain organizations and coins or bullion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - House - House Motion to concur with amendments in conference failed - Yea: 19 Nay: 102 (Y: 19 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 2 (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 109 Nay: 14 (Y: 109 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 2 (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 109 Nay: 14 (Y: 109 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in Conference |
2018-05-01 | House | House Motion to concur with amendments in conference failed; Yea: 19 Nay: 102 (Remains in Conference) |
2018-05-01 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Senator Holland is appointed to replace Senator Francisco on the Conference Committee |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Senator Francisco is appointed to replace Senator Holland on the Conference Committee |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Tyson, Senator Kerschen and Senator Holland appointed as conferees |
2018-04-02 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Johnson , Representative Phillips and Representative Sawyer as conferees |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 2 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Tyson was adopted |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Tyson |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Tyson was adopted |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Tyson |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 22, 2018, 09:30 AM Room 548-S |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2018-02-09 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, February 8, 2018 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2018-02-08 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 109 Nay: 14 |
2018-02-08 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-02-08 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Waymaster was adopted |
2018-02-08 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Waymaster |
2018-02-08 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-01-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation |
2018-01-22 | House | House Hearing: Monday, January 22, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 346-S |
2018-01-17 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2018-01-17 | House | House Introduced |