KS HB2490 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 7, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 7, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the state treasurer to determine account owners and designated beneficiaries for an ABLE savings account, adding who may open such an account and requiring compliance with the federal internal revenue code.
Title
Authorizing the state treasurer to determine account owners and designated beneficiaries for an ABLE savings account, adding who may open such an account and requiring compliance with the federal internal revenue code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 118 Nay: 3 (Y: 118 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 118 Nay: 3 (Y: 118 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 7, 2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Wednesday, March 30, 2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 2, 2022, 9:30 AM Room 546-S |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2022-02-09 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 118 Nay: 3 |
2022-02-09 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2022-01-31 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Children and Seniors |
2022-01-24 | House | House Hearing: Monday, January 24, 2022, 1:30 PM Room 152-S |
2022-01-18 | House | House Referred to Committee on Children and Seniors |
2022-01-18 | House | House Introduced |