KS HB2489 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 13, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 13, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amending provisions of the technology-enabled fiduciary financial institutions act relating to out-of-state financial institutions, banks and trust companies conducting fidfin transactions, fees and assessments, examinations, disclosures to consumers and requiring such institutions to be mandatory reporters for purposes of elder abuse.
Title
Amending provisions of the technology-enabled fiduciary financial institutions act relating to out-of-state financial institutions, banks and trust companies conducting fidfin transactions, fees and assessments, examinations, disclosures to consumers and requiring such institutions to be mandatory reporters for purposes of elder abuse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - House Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 117 Nay: 0 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 37 Nay: 0 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 120 Nay: 0 (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 37 Nay: 0 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 120 Nay: 0 (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | House | House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 13, 2022 |
2022-04-25 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 8, 2022 |
2022-04-25 | House | House Reengrossed on Monday, April 4, 2022 |
2022-03-31 | House | House Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 117 Nay: 0 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Longbine, Senator Fagg and Senator Pittman appointed as conferees |
2022-03-28 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Kelly , Representative Hoheisel and Representative Xu as conferees |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 37 Nay: 0 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 3, 2022, 9:30 AM Room 546-S |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2022-02-17 | House | House Engrossed on Wednesday, February 16, 2022 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2022-02-16 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 120 Nay: 0 |
2022-02-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2022-02-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Wasinger was rejected |
2022-02-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Wasinger |
2022-02-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2022-02-10 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Rural Development |
2022-01-26 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 26, 2022, 9:00 AM Room 218-N |
2022-01-18 | House | House Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Rural Development |
2022-01-18 | House | House Introduced |