KS HB2487 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-6)
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-6)
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a 0% state rate for sales and use taxes for sales of food and food ingredients and providing for the levying of taxes by cities and counties, providing for an exemption from sales and use taxes for sales of farm products sold at farmers' markets, and discontinuing the nonrefundable food sales tax credit.
Title
Providing a 0% state rate for sales and use taxes for sales of food and food ingredients and providing for the levying of taxes by cities and counties, providing for an exemption from sales and use taxes for sales of farm products sold at farmers' markets, and discontinuing the nonrefundable food sales tax credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - House - House Motion to withdraw from Committee on Taxation not adopted - Yea: 48 Nay: 74 (Y: 48 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in Committee |
2022-04-26 | House | House Motion to withdraw from Committee on Taxation not adopted; Yea: 48 Nay: 74 |
2022-04-25 | House | House Motion to withdraw from Committee on Taxation pending |
2022-01-25 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 25, 2022, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2022-01-14 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2022-01-14 | House | House Introduced |