KS HB2483 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Due process for termination of certain teachers' contracts.
Title
Due process for termination of certain teachers' contracts.
Sponsors
Rep. Clay Aurand [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in Committee |
2018-01-24 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 24, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 546-S |
2018-01-17 | House | House Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-01-17 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2483/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2483_00_0000.pdf |