KS HB2481 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 7, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 7, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing KP&F participating service credit purchase for certain in-state nonfederal governmental employment.
Title
Authorizing KP&F participating service credit purchase for certain in-state nonfederal governmental employment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 7, 2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Wednesday, March 30, 2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 15, 2022, 9:30 AM Room 546-S |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2022-02-23 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 0 |
2022-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2022-02-17 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Insurance and Pensions |
2022-01-24 | House | House Hearing: Monday, January 24, 2022, 3:30 PM Room 218-N |
2022-01-13 | House | House Referred to Committee on Insurance and Pensions |
2022-01-13 | House | House Introduced |