KS HB2481 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the adoption protection act and updating the Kansas adoption and relinquishment act.
Title
Creating the adoption protection act and updating the Kansas adoption and relinquishment act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Motion to concur with amendments failed - Yea: 58 Nay: 64 (Y: 58 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 28 Nay: 12 (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Rogers was rejected - Yea: 16 Nay: 21 (Y: 16 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Baumgardner was adopted - Yea: 24 Nay: 14 (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 117 Nay: 0 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 28 Nay: 12 (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Rogers was rejected - Yea: 16 Nay: 21 (Y: 16 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Baumgardner was adopted - Yea: 24 Nay: 14 (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 117 Nay: 0 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in Conference |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Wilborn, Senator Lynn and Senator Haley appointed as conferees |
2018-03-29 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Finch , Representative Ralph and Representative Carmichael as conferees |
2018-03-29 | House | House Motion to Reconsider Adopted |
2018-03-29 | House | House Motion to concur with amendments failed; Yea: 58 Nay: 64 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 28 Nay: 12 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Rogers was rejected Yea: 16 Nay: 21 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Rogers |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Baumgardner was adopted Yea: 24 Nay: 14 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Senator Rogers raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Baumgardner |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 15, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2018-02-22 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 117 Nay: 0 |
2018-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2018-02-19 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-30 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 30, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 112-N |
2018-01-17 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-17 | House | House Introduced |