KS HB2479 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making unlawful the capture or possession of ornate box turtles.
Title
Making unlawful the capture or possession of ornate box turtles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, January 27, 2022, 3:30 PM Room 112-N |
2022-01-13 | House | House Referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2022-01-13 | House | House Introduced |