KS HB2479 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Codifying the NAIC corporate governance model regulation into statute.
Title
Codifying the NAIC corporate governance model regulation into statute.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 125 Nay: 0 (Y: 125 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died on Senate General Orders |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 10, 2020, 9:30 AM Room 546-S |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2020-02-26 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 125 Nay: 0 |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2020-02-19 | House | House Withdrawn from Consent Calendar and placed on General Orders |
2020-02-18 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2020-01-29 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 29, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 212-N |
2020-01-23 | House | House Referred to Committee on Insurance |
2020-01-23 | House | House Introduced |