KS HB2479 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, May 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, May 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing criminal cases to be stayed during state appeal of writ of habeas corpus relief; creating procedures and limitations concerning contact with jurors following a criminal jury trial; clarifying methods of recording grand jury proceedings.
Title
Allowing criminal cases to be stayed during state appeal of writ of habeas corpus relief; creating procedures and limitations concerning contact with jurors following a criminal jury trial; clarifying methods of recording grand jury proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 106 Nay: 13 (Y: 106 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Approved by Governor on Monday, May 14, 2018 |
2018-05-04 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 08, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, May 3, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 106 Nay: 13 |
2018-05-03 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Wilborn, Senator Lynn and Senator Haley appointed as conferees |
2018-04-02 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Finch , Representative Ralph and Representative Carmichael as conferees |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Senator Wilborn raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Haley |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 07, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2018-02-21 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 |
2018-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2018-02-02 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-22 | House | House Hearing: Monday, January 22, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 112-N |
2018-01-17 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-17 | House | House Introduced |